PA HR295 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Adopted (200-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Adopted (200-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing February 11, 2024, as the "International Day of Women and Girls in Science" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing February 11, 2024, as the "International Day of Women and Girls in Science" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - House Floor: HR 295 PN 2540 (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Tourism And Economic And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Tourism And Economic And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Adopted (200-1) |
2024-03-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |