PA HR281 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 18 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-13 - Removed from table
Status: Introduced on May 18 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-13 - Removed from table
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to study the issue of workplace pay disparity, to reexamine existing Federal and State laws relating to that issue and to make recommendations to the General Assembly.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to study the issue of workplace pay disparity, to reexamine existing Federal and State laws relating to that issue and to make recommendations to the General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-11-13 | Removed from table | |
2008-11-13 | Laid on the table | |
2008-07-01 | Removed from table | |
2008-07-01 | Laid on the table | |
2008-06-04 | Removed from table | |
2008-06-04 | Laid on the table | |
2008-03-18 | Reported as amended | |
2007-05-18 | Referred to LABOR RELATIONS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=281 |