PA HR280 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Adopted (199-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Adopted (199-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating March 26, 2024, as "Bangladesh Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating March 26, 2024, as "Bangladesh Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House Floor: HR 280 PN 2409 (Y: 199 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Adopted (199-2) |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-12-11 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |