PA HR206 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-2)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution petitioning the Congress of the United States to call a Convention for proposing amendments pursuant to Article V of the Constitution of the United States limited to proposing amendments that impose fiscal restraints on the Federal Government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the Federal Government and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution petitioning the Congress of the United States to call a Convention for proposing amendments pursuant to Article V of the Constitution of the United States limited to proposing amendments that impose fiscal restraints on the Federal Government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the Federal Government and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04279 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-12-16 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04279 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-08 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-03-25 | House | Removed from table |
2020-03-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |