PA HR187 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Adopted (134-64)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Adopted (134-64)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Governors of New York and New Jersey to end anti-pipeline policies that block Pennsylvania natural gas from reaching markets in New England.
Title
Urging the Governors of New York and New Jersey to end anti-pipeline policies that block Pennsylvania natural gas from reaching markets in New England.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Floor: HR 187 PN 2868 (Y: 134 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Floor: HR 187 PN 2868, 2021 A3822, GERMANE (Y: 87 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-28 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Floor: HR 187 PN 2868, 2021 A3822, GERMANE (Y: 87 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-28 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Adopted (134-64) |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |