PA HR183 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a comprehensive review of data maintained by the Department of Education and the Department of Human Services on the number of transition-age youth and young adults diagnosed with Autism Spectrum Disorders.
Title
Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a comprehensive review of data maintained by the Department of Education and the Department of Human Services on the number of transition-age youth and young adults diagnosed with Autism Spectrum Disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-07-12 | House | Removed from table |
2016-07-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-01-27 | House | Removed from table |
2016-01-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-15 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-07-01 | House | Removed from table |
2015-07-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |