PA HB980 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for fund balance limits and for moratorium on establishment of new cyber charter schools.
Title
Providing for fund balance limits and for moratorium on establishment of new cyber charter schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-23 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-04 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |