PA HB975 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-7)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-26 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-26 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 6, 1951 (P.L.69, No.20), known as The Landlord and Tenant Act of 1951, in recovery of possession, providing for early termination of leases by individuals with disabilities and senior citizens.
Title
In recovery of possession, providing for early termination of leases by individuals with disabilities and senior citizens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 975 PN 4131, FP (Y: 160 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 975 PN 3195, 2015 A7025, CALTAGIRONE (Y: 86 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 975 PN 3195, 2015 A7024, CALTAGIRONE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06781 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 975 PN 4131, FP (Y: 160 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 975 PN 3195, 2015 A7025, CALTAGIRONE (Y: 86 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 975 PN 3195, 2015 A7024, CALTAGIRONE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06781 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2016-10-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (160-30) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-14 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-13 | House | First consideration |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |