PA HB974 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing municipalities to implement senior citizen tax reduction incentive volunteer exchange programs.
Title
Authorizing municipalities to implement senior citizen tax reduction incentive volunteer exchange programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 974 PN 3593, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 974 PN 2119, 2019 A2012, OTTEN (Y: 200 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01760 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01833 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01832 (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01831 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01723 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01819 (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 974 PN 3593, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 974 PN 2119, 2019 A2012, OTTEN (Y: 200 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01760 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01833 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01832 (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01831 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01723 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01819 (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2020-04-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-1) |
2020-04-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-20 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-04-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-12 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |