PA HB973 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in county correctional institutions, further providing for board meetings.
Title
In county correctional institutions, further providing for board meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 973 PN 1131, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-04-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2018-04-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-09 | House | Second consideration |
2018-03-14 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |