PA HB973 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-10)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-10)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 29, 1953 (P.L.304, No.66), known as the Vital Statistics Law of 1953, further providing for definitions, for registration districts, local registrars and appointment and removal of and for death and fetal death registration, certificates to be filed; providing for disposition of cremated remains of veterans; and further providing for records and disclosure by local registrars.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for registration districts, local registrars and appointment and removal of and for death and fetal death registration, certificates to be filed; providing for disposition of cremated remains of veterans; and further providing for records and disclosure by local registrars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-29 - House - HB 973 PN 3835, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - HB 973 PN 3835, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-24 - House - HB 973 PN 1945, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - HB 973 PN 3835, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-24 - House - HB 973 PN 1945, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | House | Act No. 101 |
2012-07-05 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-06-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-06-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-06-29 | House | Signed in House |
2012-06-29 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0) |
2012-06-29 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-06-28 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-06-28 | House | In the House |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2011-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2011-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-03-09 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |