PA HB972 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for sport activities in public institutions of higher education and public school entities to be expressly designated male, female or coed; and creating causes of action for harms suffered by designation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for sport activities in public institutions of higher education and public school entities to be expressly designated male, female or coed; and creating causes of action for harms suffered by designation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 972 PN 2886, FP (Y: 115 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 972 PN 2886, 2021 A3838 (Y: 85 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-29 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03771 (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-21SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2022-04-12SenateIn the Senate
2022-04-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (115-84)
2022-04-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2022-04-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-04-11HouseSecond consideration
2022-03-30HouseRemoved from table
2022-03-29HouseLaid on the table
2022-03-29HouseFirst consideration
2022-03-29HouseReported as amended
2021-04-05HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=972
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0972&pn=1133
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0972&pn=2886
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0972P2886.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=03/29/2022&RollCallId=1346
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=03/29/2022&RollCallId=1347
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=794
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=811
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/12/2022&RollCallId=1454

Bill Comments

feedback