PA HB968 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873, No.1), known as the Taxpayer Relief Act, in senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for the definition of "income" and providing for the definition of "Social Security substitute pension."
Title
In senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for the definition of "income" and providing for the definition of "Social Security substitute pension."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A07337 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A07337 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-20 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to FINANCE |