PA HB967 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - Act No. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for industrial hemp research; imposing powers and duties on the Department of Agriculture and the Legislative Reference Bureau; imposing criminal and civil penalties; abrogating a regulation; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for industrial hemp research; imposing powers and duties on the Department of Agriculture and the Legislative Reference Bureau; imposing criminal and civil penalties; abrogating a regulation; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-07-10 - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-10 - House Floor: HB 967 PN 3706, CONCUR (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate Floor: HB 967 PN 3706, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House Floor: HB 967 PN 3087, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House Floor: HB 967 PN 2312, 2015 A6279, FLYNN (Y: 192 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House Floor: HB 967 PN 2312, 2015 A6395, DIAMOND (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03457 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03457 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-20HouseAct No. 92
2016-07-20HouseApproved by the Governor
2016-07-11HousePresented to the Governor
2016-07-11HouseSigned in Senate
2016-07-10HouseSigned in House
2016-07-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (184-0)
2016-07-10HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2016-07-01HouseReferred to RULES
2016-07-01HouseIn the House
2016-07-01SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2016-07-01SenateRe-reported as amended
2016-06-29SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2016-06-29SenateSecond consideration
2016-06-23SenateFirst consideration
2016-06-23SenateReported as amended
2016-04-12SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2016-04-06SenateIn the Senate
2016-04-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2016-04-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2016-04-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2016-04-05HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2016-03-23HouseRemoved from table
2015-11-18HouseLaid on the table
2015-11-18HouseRemoved from table
2015-10-06HouseLaid on the table
2015-10-06HouseFirst consideration
2015-10-06HouseReported as amended
2015-04-15HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=967
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0967&pn=1225
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0967&pn=2312
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0967&pn=3087
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0967&pn=3619
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0967&pn=3706
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=10/06/2015&rNbr=962
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=10/06/2015&rNbr=961
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=10/06/2015&RollCallId=961
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=10/06/2015&RollCallId=962
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1248
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1249
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1275
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/06/2016&RollCallId=1531
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=06/23/2016&RollCallId=894
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=06/23/2016&RollCallId=892
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=627
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/01/2016&RollCallId=996
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1653
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=07/10/2016&RollCallId=2076

Bill Comments

feedback