PA HB95 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-24 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-24 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in fishing licenses, further providing for deployed Pennsylvania National Guard members and for reserve component of armed forces members.
Title
In fishing licenses, further providing for deployed Pennsylvania National Guard members and for reserve component of armed forces members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-11 - House - HB 95 PN 87, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-24 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES | |
2009-02-11 | In the Senate | |
2009-02-11 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-02-10 | Second consideration | |
2009-02-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-02-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-02-04 | Removed from table | |
2009-02-03 | Laid on the table | |
2009-02-03 | First consideration | |
2009-02-03 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |