PA HB946 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-21 - Act No. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for pharmacy audit procedures, for registration of pharmacy benefits managers and auditing entities, for maximum allowable cost transparency and for prescription drugs reimbursed under the PACE and PACENET program; and making related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for pharmacy audit procedures, for registration of pharmacy benefits managers and auditing entities, for maximum allowable cost transparency and for prescription drugs reimbursed under the PACE and PACENET program; and making related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-10-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 946 PN 4111, CONCUR (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 946 PN 4111, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 946 PN 3933, A10845, WHITE AMENDMENT NO. A-10845 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 946 PN 3933, A10665, BROWNE AMENDMENT NO. A-10665 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 946 PN 3693, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 946 PN 3693, 2015 A9397, BAKER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 946 PN 2371, 2015 A9302, BAKER (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 946 PN 2371, 2015 A9145, BAKER (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03541 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03541 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-21HouseAct No. 169
2016-11-21HouseApproved by the Governor
2016-11-14HousePresented to the Governor
2016-11-09HouseSigned in Senate
2016-10-27HouseSigned in House
2016-10-27HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (185-0)
2016-10-27HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2016-10-27HouseReferred to RULES
2016-10-26HouseIn the House
2016-10-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-1)
2016-10-24SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2016-10-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2016-10-17SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2016-09-27SenateFirst consideration
2016-09-27SenateReported as amended
2016-07-28SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2016-07-01SenateIn the Senate
2016-07-01HouseFinal passage (198-0)
2016-07-01HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2016-07-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2016-06-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2016-06-30HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2016-06-23HouseRemoved from table
2015-11-23HouseLaid on the table
2015-11-23HouseRemoved from table
2015-10-19HouseLaid on the table
2015-10-19HouseFirst consideration
2015-10-19HouseReported as amended
2015-08-18HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=946
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0946&pn=2120
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0946&pn=2371
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0946&pn=3693
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0946&pn=3707
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0946&pn=3933
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0946&pn=4111
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=10/07/2015&rNbr=978
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=10/07/2015&rNbr=977
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=10/07/2015&RollCallId=977
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=10/07/2015&RollCallId=978
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1624
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1625
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/01/2016&RollCallId=2065
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1637
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1643
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=09/27/2016&RollCallId=1056
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/19/2016&RollCallId=1133
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=718
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=783
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1903
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/27/2016&RollCallId=2317

Bill Comments

feedback