PA HB94 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for resident license and fee exemptions.
Title
In hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for resident license and fee exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-11 - House - HB 94 PN 86, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-15 | First consideration | |
2010-06-15 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES | |
2009-02-11 | In the Senate | |
2009-02-11 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-02-10 | Second consideration | |
2009-02-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-02-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-02-04 | Removed from table | |
2009-02-03 | Laid on the table | |
2009-02-03 | First consideration | |
2009-02-03 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |