PA HB939 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 8, 1978 (P.L.752, No.140), known as the Public Employee Pension Forfeiture Act, further providing for definitions, for disqualification and forfeiture of benefits and for restitution for monetary loss; and repealing a retroactivity provision.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for disqualification and forfeiture of benefits and for restitution for monetary loss; and repealing a retroactivity provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 939 PN 1498, FP (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00748 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 939 PN 1498, FP (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00748 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2955 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-1) |
2017-05-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-26 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-24 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-19 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |