PA HB928 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Amended on third consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of February 9, 1999 (P.L.1, No.1), known as the Capital Facilities Debt Enabling Act, in capital facilities, further providing for appropriation for and limitation on redevelopment assistance capital projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In capital facilities, further providing for appropriation for and limitation on redevelopment assistance capital projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 928 PN 2409, FP (Y: 121 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Floor: HB 928 PN 1488, 2015 A2503, YOUNGBLOOD (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-10-24SenateAmended on third consideration
2016-10-17SenateRemoved from table
2016-05-16SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2016-04-05SenateSecond consideration
2016-03-23SenateFirst consideration
2016-03-23SenateReported as committed
2015-10-23SenateReferred to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-10-21SenateIn the Senate
2015-10-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (121-76)
2015-10-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-10-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-10-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2015-10-19HouseRemoved from table
2015-09-21HouseLaid on the table
2015-09-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-06-23HouseRe-committed to RULES
2015-06-23HouseFirst consideration
2015-06-23HouseReported as committed
2015-05-11HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=928
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0928&pn=1488
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0928&pn=2409
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0928&pn=4106
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/23/2015&rNbr=595
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=780
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=798
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/21/2015&rNbr=1033
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/23/2015&RollCallId=595
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/21/2015&RollCallId=1033
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=03/23/2016&RollCallId=689

Bill Comments 750

feedback