PA HB922 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions relating to retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for definitions.
Title
In preliminary provisions relating to retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 922 PN 1910, FP (Y: 114 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 922 PN 1075, 2017 A1450, BRADFORD (Y: 82 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 922 PN 1075, 2017 A1436, TALLMAN (Y: 121 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 922 PN 1075, 2017 A1450, BRADFORD (Y: 82 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 922 PN 1075, 2017 A1436, TALLMAN (Y: 121 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2017-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (114-80) |
2017-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-05 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-05-22 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-09 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |