PA HB915 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 6, 2010 (P.L. , No.1A), known as the General Appropriation Act of 2010, by further providing for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Department of Education.
Title
By further providing for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Department of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - HB 915 PN 1388, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - HB 915 PN 1388, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-04-25 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-04-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2011-04-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-04-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-06 | House | Second consideration |
2011-04-04 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2011-03-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-03-08 | House | Removed from table |
2011-03-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-03-07 | House | First consideration |
2011-03-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-03-03 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |