PA HB864 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), known as the Local Option Small Games of Chance Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for legislative intent and for definitions; in games of chance, further providing for prize limits and for major league sports drawing, providing for airport 50/50 drawing and further providing for licensing of eligible organizations; in club licensees, further providing for club licensee and for distribution of proceeds; and, in enforcement, further providing for enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for legislative intent and for definitions; in games of chance, further providing for prize limits and for major league sports drawing, providing for airport 50/50 drawing and further providing for licensing of eligible organizations; in club licensees, further providing for club licensee and for distribution of proceeds; and, in enforcement, further providing for enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 1984, FP (Y: 136 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 1984, 2017 A1870, MOUL (Y: 174 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 1984, 2017 A1870, SUSP RULES, MOUL (Y: 174 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 1984, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 169 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 970, 2017 A1474, PETRARCA (Y: 154 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 970, 2017 A1695, MUSTIO (Y: 65 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-18SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-12SenateRemoved from table
2018-06-12SenateLaid on the table
2018-04-24SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-24SenateReported as amended
2017-06-16SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2017-06-13SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-13HouseFinal passage (136-56)
2017-06-13HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2017-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-05-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-25HouseReported as committed
2017-03-16HouseReferred to GAMING OVERSIGHT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=864
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0864&pn=0970
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0864&pn=1984
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0864&pn=2009
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0864&pn=3433
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=54&theDate=04/25/2017&RollCallId=299
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=465
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=466
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=487
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=488
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=489
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=490
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=587
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=04/24/2018&RollCallId=808

Bill Comments

feedback