PA HB85 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for exemption from assessment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, providing for exemption from assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 85 PN 3625, FP (Y: 154 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 85 PN 3577, 2017 A7379, GILLEN (Y: 141 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 85 PN 3577, 2017 A7396, LONGIETTI (Y: 84 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 85 PN 3577, 2017 A7380, LAWRENCE (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2018-06-11SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (154-39)
2018-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-06HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-04HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-04HouseReported as committed
2018-05-24HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=85
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0085&pn=3577
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0085&pn=3625
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/04/2018&RollCallId=1568
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1277
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1278
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1279
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1289
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/11/2018&RollCallId=1617

Bill Comments

feedback