PA HB847 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3379
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for prohibited use of public assistance funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, further providing for prohibited use of public assistance funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 847 PN 2512, FP (Y: 154 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Floor: HB 847 PN 1984, 2019 A2763, FRANKEL (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01612 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3379
2019-09-25SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-09-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-09-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (154-32)
2019-09-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-09-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-09-18HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-09-17HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-04HouseReported as amended
2019-03-14HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=847
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0847&pn=0947
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0847&pn=1984
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0847&pn=2512
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0847&pn=3379
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=590
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=591
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=646
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=656
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/19/2019&RollCallId=1048

Bill Comments

feedback