PA HB84 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 29, 1953 (P.L.304, No.66), known as the Vital Statistics Law of 1953, in registration district administration, further providing for local registrars' compensation; in birth registration, further providing for children born in a country other than the United States and providing for certified copies of birth records, for optional city and county issuance and for Legislative Budget and Finance Committee study; in records, further providing for disclosure by local registrars; and making a related repeal.
Title
In registration district administration, further providing for local registrars' compensation; in birth registration, further providing for children born in a country other than the United States and providing for certified copies of birth records, for optional city and county issuance and for Legislative Budget and Finance Committee study; in records, further providing for disclosure by local registrars; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 84 PN 3690, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 84 PN 3553, 2017 A7540, MULLERY (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 84 PN 3553, 2017 A7218, HANNA (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 84 PN 3553, 2017 A7550, LAWRENCE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07137 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 84 PN 3690, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 84 PN 3553, 2017 A7540, MULLERY (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 84 PN 3553, 2017 A7218, HANNA (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 84 PN 3553, 2017 A7550, LAWRENCE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07137 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-1) |
2018-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-13 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-06-12 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-22 | House | First consideration |
2018-05-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to HEALTH |