PA HB821 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-24 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-24 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act requiring certain long-term care facilities to coordinate with licensing agencies and local area agencies on aging to provide assistance to consumers in circumstances involving relocation of consumers; and providing for powers and duties of the Department of Aging.
Title
Requiring certain long-term care facilities to coordinate with licensing agencies and local area agencies on aging to provide assistance to consumers in circumstances involving relocation of consumers; and providing for powers and duties of the Department of Aging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-20 - House - HB 821 PN 1277, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-24 | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH | |
2009-04-20 | In the Senate | |
2009-04-20 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-04-01 | Second consideration | |
2009-04-01 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-25 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-25 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-25 | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1277 | |
2009-03-24 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-24 | First consideration | |
2009-03-24 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-10 | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |