PA HB815 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 198
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 198
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of sexual abuse of children; and providing for the offense of transmission of sexually explicit images by minor.
Title
Further providing for the offense of sexual abuse of children; and providing for the offense of transmission of sexually explicit images by minor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - House - HB 815 PN 4234, CONCUR (Y: 188 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - HB 815 PN 4234, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - HB 815 PN 1711, RECOM TO JUDICIARY, VITALI (Y: 43 N: 155 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-05-23 - House - HB 815 PN 1711, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 178 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - HB 815 PN 4234, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - HB 815 PN 1711, RECOM TO JUDICIARY, VITALI (Y: 43 N: 155 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-05-23 - House - HB 815 PN 1711, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 178 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-25 | House | Act No. 198 |
2012-10-25 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2012-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (188-3) |
2012-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-10-17 | House | In the House |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (37-12) |
2012-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2012-10-03 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-10-02 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-10-02 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-06-03 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-05-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-05-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (178-20) |
2011-05-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-10 | House | Second consideration |
2011-05-09 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-03 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |