PA HB806 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review and for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review; providing for regulations deemed withdrawn; further providing for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations by the commission; and providing for concurrent resolution required for economically significant regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review and for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review; providing for regulations deemed withdrawn; further providing for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations by the commission; and providing for concurrent resolution required for economically significant regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 806 PN 899, FP (Y: 103 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 806 PN 899, MOT RECON, STEPHENS (Y: 109 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 806 PN 899, FP (Y: 102 N: 91 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 806 PN 899, MOT CONST, KRUEGER (Y: 108 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateReferred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
2019-04-30SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-30HouseFinal passage (103-91)
2019-04-30HouseVote on final passage reconsidered
2019-04-30HouseThird consideration and final passage (102-91)
2019-04-30HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-29HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-17HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-16HouseReported as committed
2019-03-13HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=806
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0806&pn=0899
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=04/16/2019&RollCallId=291
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=221
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=222
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=223
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=224
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=395

Bill Comments

feedback