PA HB773 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 59 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 59 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for grading and for penalties.
Title
In driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for grading and for penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Quinn [R] | Rep. Louis Schmitt [R] | Rep. Todd Polinchock [R] | Rep. Nancy Guenst [D] |
Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D] | Sen. Rosemary Brown [R] | Rep. Mark Gillen [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 773 PN 1022, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 773 PN 1022, FP (Y: 168 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 773 PN 1022, 2021 A617 (Y: 80 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00510 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 773 PN 1022, FP (Y: 168 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 773 PN 1022, 2021 A617 (Y: 80 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00510 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Act No. 59 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-4) |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-05-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-11-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (168-32) |
2021-11-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-15 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-23 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |