PA HB757 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 899 over the Clarion River connecting Barnett Township, Jefferson County, and Barnett Township, Forest County, as the PFC Patrick T. Cassatt Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 899 over the Clarion River connecting Barnett Township, Jefferson County, and Barnett Township, Forest County, as the PFC Patrick T. Cassatt Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 757 PN 807, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 757 PN 807, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-04-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2019-04-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-17 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-10 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |