PA HB754 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 1, 1984 (P.L.206, No.43), known as the Pennsylvania Safe Drinking Water Act, further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 754 PN 1141, FP (Y: 120 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 754 PN 768, 2021 A594, DAY (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
2021-04-06SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (120-81)
2021-04-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-05HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-03-22HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-16HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-16HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-16HouseReported as committed
2021-03-08HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=754
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0754&pn=0768
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0754&pn=1141
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0754P1141.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=149
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=112
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=131
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/06/2021&RollCallId=269

Bill Comments 750

feedback