PA HB74 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-02 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 28, 1984 (P.L.150, No.28), known as the Automobile Lemon Law, further providing for definitions, for manufacturer's duty for refund or replacement and for presumption of a reasonable number of attempts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for manufacturer's duty for refund or replacement and for presumption of a reasonable number of attempts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 74 PN 2808, FP (Y: 187 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 74 PN 69, 2017 A4442, FARRY (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-02SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2017-12-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-4)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-11HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-10-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-12HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-12HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-12HouseReported as committed
2017-01-23HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=74
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0074&pn=0069
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0074&pn=2808
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=06/12/2017&RollCallId=555
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=920
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1169
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=938

Bill Comments

feedback