PA HB74 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of endangering welfare of children.
Title
In offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of endangering welfare of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 74 PN 65, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 74 PN 65, 2015 A996, MILLER, D. (Y: 84 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 74 PN 65, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 74 PN 65, 2015 A996, MILLER, D. (Y: 84 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-05-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2015-05-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-05 | House | Second consideration |
2015-05-04 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-21 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |