PA HB731 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for locking device for firearms; providing for safe storage of firearm when not in use; and imposing penalties.
Title
In firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for locking device for firearms; providing for safe storage of firearm when not in use; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Floor: HB 731 PN 1091, 2023 A433, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 101 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00241 (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Floor: HB 731 PN 1091, 2023 A433, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 101 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00241 (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | House | Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71) |
2023-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-03 | House | Second consideration |
2023-05-02 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-01 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-01 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |