PA HB710 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-15 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-15 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 24, 1963 (P.L.1175, No.497), known as the Mechanics' Lien Law of 1963, further providing for right to lien and amount and for discharge of lien on payment into court or entry of security.
Title
Further providing for right to lien and amount and for discharge of lien on payment into court or entry of security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-10-02 | House | Removed from table |
2012-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-10-01 | House | First consideration |
2012-10-01 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-10-31 | House | Re-referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2011-10-31 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |