PA HB71 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-30 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-30 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, providing for notice to school district; and further providing for application for final approval.
Title
An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, providing for notice to school district; and further providing for application for final approval.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-30 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2007-06-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-30 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-29 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-29 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-06-28 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-04-25 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-25 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-24 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-24 | First consideration | |
2007-04-24 | Reported as committed | |
2007-02-16 | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 492 | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=71 |