PA HB689 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-15 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-15 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in criminal history record information, further providing for definitions, for general regulations, for expungement, for petition for limited access, for clean slate limited access, for exceptions, for effects of expunged records and records subject to limited access and for employer immunity from liability.
Title
In criminal history record information, further providing for definitions, for general regulations, for expungement, for petition for limited access, for clean slate limited access, for exceptions, for effects of expunged records and records subject to limited access and for employer immunity from liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01990 (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 689 PN 1360, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 189 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 689 PN 1139, 2023 A679 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 689 PN 1139, 2023 A679, MOTION TO SUSPEND RULES (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 689 PN 1139, 2023 A531 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00413 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00373 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01990 (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 689 PN 1360, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 189 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 689 PN 1139, 2023 A679 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 689 PN 1139, 2023 A679, MOTION TO SUSPEND RULES (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 689 PN 1139, 2023 A531 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00413 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00373 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2023-09-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-14) |
2023-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-03 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |