PA HB68 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in dispositions independent of letters, further providing for payments to family and funeral directors.
Title
In dispositions independent of letters, further providing for payments to family and funeral directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-16 - House - HB 68 PN 2039, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2009-06-16 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-16 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-15 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-08 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-01-28 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-01-28 | Removed from table | |
2009-01-27 | Laid on the table | |
2009-01-27 | First consideration | |
2009-01-27 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-26 | Referred to JUDICIARY |