PA HB677 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 7, 1990 (P.L.639, No.165), known as the Hazardous Material Emergency Planning and Response Act, in hazardous material protection, further providing for establishment and functions of local emergency planning committees and for emergency reporting requirements.
Title
In hazardous material protection, further providing for establishment and functions of local emergency planning committees and for emergency reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01537 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01537 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01537 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-07 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-04 | House | Removed from table |
2015-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-17 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-17 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |