PA HB665 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on October 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-04 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on October 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-04 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) and 57 (Notaries Public) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in powers of attorney, further providing for general provisions; and, in Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts, further providing for short form certificates, for implementation of power of attorney and for durable powers of attorney.
Title
In powers of attorney, further providing for general provisions; and, in Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts, further providing for short form certificates, for implementation of power of attorney and for durable powers of attorney.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 665 PN 1187, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 665 PN 1187, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00540 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00540 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 665 PN 1187, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00540 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00540 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-04 | Senate | Act No. 103 |
2016-10-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-0) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-03-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-20 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-15 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-14 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |