PA HB649 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for access to congregate care facilities for essential caregivers, for additional safety requirements for residents of congregate care facilities, for suspension of access for essential caregivers and for costs associated with safety measures related to essential caregivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for access to congregate care facilities for essential caregivers, for additional safety requirements for residents of congregate care facilities, for suspension of access for essential caregivers and for costs associated with safety measures related to essential caregivers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 649 PN 1026, Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Floor: HB 649 PN 1026, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Floor: HB 649 PN 961, 2021 A525, RAPP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00441 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01SenateAct No. 67
2021-07-01SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-06-22SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-06-21SenateSigned in Senate
2021-06-16SenateSigned in House
2021-06-10SenateThird consideration and final passage, June 16, 2021 (32 - 18)
2021-06-10SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-06-09SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-09SenateSecond consideration
2021-06-08SenateFirst consideration
2021-06-08SenateReported as committed
2021-03-25SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2021-03-24SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-03-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-23HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-03-22HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-17HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-17HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-17HouseReported as amended
2021-03-15HouseRe-referred to HEALTH
2021-03-15HouseReported with request to re-refer to HEALTH
2021-02-24HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=649
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0649&pn=0605
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0649&pn=0961
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0649&pn=1026
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0649P1026.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0649P1026.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=03/15/2021&RollCallId=131
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/17/2021&RollCallId=158
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/17/2021&RollCallId=159
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=93
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=104
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=245
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=06/08/2021&RollCallId=257
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/10/2021&RollCallId=289
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=175

Bill Comments

feedback