PA HB64 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for civil penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 64 PN 68, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 64 PN 68, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25SenateAct No. 116
2020-11-25SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-11-20SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-11-19SenateSigned in Senate
2020-11-19SenateSigned in House
2020-11-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2020-11-18SenateRemoved from table
2020-06-10SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2020-04-21SenateRemoved from table
2020-04-21SenateLaid on the table
2020-01-28SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-12SenateReported as committed
2019-03-28SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-03-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2019-03-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-19HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-18HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-13HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=64
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0064&pn=0068
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=03/13/2019&RollCallId=101
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=115
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/20/2019&RollCallId=156
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=305
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=01/28/2020&RollCallId=722
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=759

Bill Comments

feedback