PA HB629 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-12)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for patient access to diagnostics and treatments for Lyme disease and related tick-borne illnesses; and requiring health care policies to provide certain coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for patient access to diagnostics and treatments for Lyme disease and related tick-borne illnesses; and requiring health care policies to provide certain coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 629 PN 1353, FP (Y: 158 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 629 PN 1090, A00697-1, ROTHMAN (Y: 54 N: 143 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 629 PN 1090, 2019 A669, RAPP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00425 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2019-04-10SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (158-34)
2019-04-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-09HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-08HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-25HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-25HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-25HouseReported as amended
2019-02-28HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=629
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0629&pn=0624
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0629&pn=1090
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0629&pn=1353
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=178
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=179
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=158
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=167
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=177
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/10/2019&RollCallId=260

Bill Comments

feedback