PA HB629 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 3005 over the outlet of Lily Lake, Conyngham Township, Luzerne County, as the Senior Officer Eric J. Williams Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 3005 over the outlet of Lily Lake, Conyngham Township, Luzerne County, as the Senior Officer Eric J. Williams Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Floor: HB 629 PN 729, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Floor: HB 629 PN 729, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-06-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-04-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2015-04-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-21 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-20 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-14 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |