PA HB621 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-28 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-28 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 18, 1875 (P.L.32, No.36), entitled "An act requiring recorders of deeds to prepare and keep in their respective offices general, direct and ad sectum indexes of deeds and mortgages recorded therein, prescribing the duty of said recorders and declaring that the entries in said general indexes shall be notice to all persons," providing for requirements of certain instruments as a condition of recordation and for a fee for reprocessing; and making editorial changes.
Title
Amending the act of March 18, 1875 (P.L.32, No.36), entitled "An act requiring recorders of deeds to prepare and keep in their respective offices general, direct and ad sectum indexes of deeds and mortgages recorded therein, prescribing the duty of said recorders and declaring that the entries in said general indexes shall be notice to all persons," providing for requirements of certain instruments as a condition of recordation and for a fee for reprocessing; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 621 PN 721, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 621 PN 721, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2015-05-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2015-05-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-12 | House | Second consideration |
2015-05-11 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-20 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |