PA HB619 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-9)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of June 25, 1931 (P.L.1352, No.332), referred to as the Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Compact, providing the Governor of each state with power to ratify or veto certain actions taken by commissioners.
Title
A Supplement to the act of June 25, 1931 (P.L.1352, No.332), referred to as the Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Compact, providing the Governor of each state with power to ratify or veto certain actions taken by commissioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-05-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2014-05-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-05-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-05-05 | House | Second consideration |
2014-04-30 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |