PA HB613 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-17 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing local taxing authorities to provide for tax exemption incentives for certain deteriorated industrial, commercial, business and residential property and for new construction in deteriorated areas of communities; providing for an exemption schedule; and establishing standards and qualifications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing local taxing authorities to provide for tax exemption incentives for certain deteriorated industrial, commercial, business and residential property and for new construction in deteriorated areas of communities; providing for an exemption schedule; and establishing standards and qualifications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 613 PN 685, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-10-17SenateRe-reported as committed
2015-06-26SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2015-06-24SenateReported as amended
2015-05-29SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
2015-05-13SenateIn the Senate
2015-05-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2015-05-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-05-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-05-12HouseSecond consideration
2015-05-11HouseRemoved from table
2015-04-13HouseLaid on the table
2015-04-13HouseFirst consideration
2015-04-13HouseReported as committed
2015-02-24HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=613
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0613&pn=0685
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0613&pn=1897
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=35&theDate=06/24/2015&rNbr=312
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=04/13/2015&rNbr=147
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=343
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/13/2015&rNbr=363
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=04/13/2015&RollCallId=147
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/13/2015&RollCallId=363
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=35&theDate=06/24/2015&RollCallId=312
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/17/2016&RollCallId=1092

Bill Comments 750

feedback