PA HB607 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 25, 1931 (P.L.1352, No.332), referred to as the Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Compact, providing for veto power by the Governor over certain actions; further providing for audits; and providing the Governor of each state with power to ratify or veto certain actions taken by commissioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of June 25, 1931 (P.L.1352, No.332), referred to as the Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Compact, providing for veto power by the Governor over certain actions; further providing for audits; and providing the Governor of each state with power to ratify or veto certain actions taken by commissioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Floor: HB 607 PN 570, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-04-19SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-1)
2021-04-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-05HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-24HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-23HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-23HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-23HouseReported as committed
2021-02-24HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback