PA HB602 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for definitions and for prohibited acts and penalties; and providing for ephedrine and pseudoephedrine and electronic tracking.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for prohibited acts and penalties; and providing for ephedrine and pseudoephedrine and electronic tracking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - House - HB 602 PN 2020, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-29 - Senate - HB 602 PN 2020, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - HB 602 PN 1222, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - HB 602 PN 664, 2013 A386, FABRIZIO (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-29 - Senate - HB 602 PN 2020, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - HB 602 PN 1222, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - HB 602 PN 664, 2013 A386, FABRIZIO (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | House | Act No. 53 |
2013-07-09 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2013-06-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (202-1) |
2013-06-30 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2013-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2013-06-29 | House | In the House |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2013-03-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-03-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-03-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-03-18 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to HEALTH |