PA HB581 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing local taxing authorities to provide for tax exemptions for improvements to deteriorated areas and dwellings to incentivize the creation and improvement of affordable housing units.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing local taxing authorities to provide for tax exemptions for improvements to deteriorated areas and dwellings to incentivize the creation and improvement of affordable housing units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 581 PN 1004, FP (Y: 183 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended A00493 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00493 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-30SenateFirst consideration
2022-03-30SenateReported as amended
2021-07-07SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
2021-06-25SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (183-18)
2021-06-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-19HouseSecond consideration
2021-04-07HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-22HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-22HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-22HouseReported as amended
2021-02-22HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=581
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0581&pn=0544
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0581&pn=1004
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0581&pn=2900
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0581P1004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=03/22/2021&RollCallId=182
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=03/22/2021&RollCallId=183
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=469
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=790

Bill Comments

feedback